Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/11/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/11/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/11/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/11/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/13/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/13/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 01/13/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/13/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/13/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/13/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/13/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/13/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 01/13/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/13/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/13/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/13/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 01/13/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/13/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/13/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 01/13/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/13/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/13/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/17/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 01/17/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/17/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/17/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/17/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/17/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/17/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/17/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/17/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/17/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/17/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/18/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 01/18/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/18/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/18/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 01/18/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 01/18/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/18/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/18/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/19/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/20/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 01/20/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/23/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 01/25/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/25/1995