There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal the Davis-Bacon Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/13/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
03/02/1995Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Economic and Educational Opportunities Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
03/02/1995Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Economic and Educational Opportunities Subcommittee on Workforce Protections
02/24/1995Executive Comment Requested from Labor.
01/27/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities
01/13/1995Referred to the House Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H235)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/13/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/27/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/27/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/27/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/27/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/14/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/14/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/14/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/14/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/14/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/14/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/14/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/22/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/22/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/07/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/07/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/29/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/29/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/29/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/29/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/11/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/20/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [R-TX-14] 08/03/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/26/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/27/1996
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/27/1995 10/24/1995 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Economic and Educational Opportunities01/13/1995 Referred to
House Economic and Educational Opportunities Subcommittee on Workforce Protections01/27/1995 Referred to
03/02/1995 Markup by
03/02/1995 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.500.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.500. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/1995)

Repeals the Davis-Bacon Act (an Act which requires that the locally prevailing wage rate be paid to various classes of laborers and mechanics working under federally-financed or federally-assisted contracts for construction, alteration, and repair of public buildings or public works).

Repeals the Copeland Act (an Act which requires the Secretary of Labor to regulate contractors and subcontractors engaged in the construction or repair of public buildings, public works, or federally financed or assisted buildings or works).