Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/13/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 01/13/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/27/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 01/27/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/27/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/27/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/27/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/27/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/27/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/14/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/14/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/14/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/14/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/14/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/14/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/14/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/14/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/14/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/22/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/22/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/07/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/07/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/07/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/29/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/29/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/29/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/29/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/29/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/11/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/24/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/20/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 08/03/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/26/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/08/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/27/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew