Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/13/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/24/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/24/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/24/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/24/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 01/24/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/24/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/24/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/24/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/25/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/25/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/25/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/31/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/31/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/31/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/31/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/31/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/28/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/28/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/28/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/28/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 03/16/1995