Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/17/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/16/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/16/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/16/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/16/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/16/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/16/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/16/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/16/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/28/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/28/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/28/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/21/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/05/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/05/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/15/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 05/15/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/07/1995