Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/17/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 01/17/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/17/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/27/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/27/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 01/27/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/27/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 01/27/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/27/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/27/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 01/27/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 01/27/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 01/27/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 01/27/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/27/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 01/27/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 01/27/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/27/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/27/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/16/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/16/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/16/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/16/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/16/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/16/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/16/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 02/16/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/16/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/16/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/16/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/23/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/23/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/23/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/23/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/23/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/23/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/23/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/15/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/15/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/15/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/15/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/15/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/15/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/15/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/15/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/25/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/25/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/25/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/25/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/25/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 05/25/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/25/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/25/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/25/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 08/01/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 08/01/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/01/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 08/01/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/01/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/01/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/01/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 08/01/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 08/01/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/04/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/04/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 08/04/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 10/18/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/18/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 10/18/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/18/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/18/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 12/22/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 12/22/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 12/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/22/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew