There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend indefinitely the authority of the Secretary of the Interior to collect a commercial operation fee in the Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/07/1995Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-46.
03/14/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 401 - 22 (Roll No. 233).
02/28/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-57.
01/17/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
04/07/1995SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
04/07/1995SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-46.
03/29/1995SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/16/1995SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/15/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/14/1995-5:57pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1995-5:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1995-5:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 401 - 22 (Roll No. 233).
03/14/1995-5:47pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
03/14/1995-3:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/14/1995-3:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/14/1995-3:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3104-3105, H3117)
03/14/1995-3:02pmHouseMr. Hansen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/28/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
02/28/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-57.
02/15/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
02/15/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/26/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/26/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/24/1995HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/18/1995HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
01/18/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/17/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
01/17/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/17/1995 Referred to
02/15/1995 Markup by
02/28/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-57
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands01/18/1995 Referred to
01/24/1995 Hearings by
01/26/1995 Markup by
01/26/1995 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/15/1995 Referred to
03/29/1995 Markup by
04/07/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-46
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation03/16/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.536.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.536. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/14/1995)

Prohibits, as of noon on September 30, 2005, the use of Highway 209 within Delaware Water Gap National Recreation Area by commercial vehicles when such use is not connected with the operation of the Area. Allows an exception for commercial vehicles serving businesses located within or in the vicinity of the Area.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior, until such time, to collect a commercial user fee of up to $25 per trip from commercial vehicles using the Highway.