Committees: H.R.536 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/17/1995 Referred to
02/15/1995 Markup by
02/28/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-57
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands01/18/1995 Referred to
01/24/1995 Hearings by
01/26/1995 Markup by
01/26/1995 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/15/1995 Referred to
03/29/1995 Markup by
04/07/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-46
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation03/16/1995 Referred to