Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/07/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/07/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/07/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/07/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/07/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/07/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/07/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/07/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/07/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/07/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/07/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/07/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/07/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/07/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/07/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/11/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/11/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/11/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/11/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/11/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/11/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/11/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/11/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/24/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/24/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/24/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/24/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/14/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/14/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/14/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/14/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/30/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/30/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/10/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/10/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 10/13/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/30/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/30/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/30/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 10/30/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 11/14/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/14/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 11/14/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/04/1996