There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Walnut Canyon National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 1995

Short Titles as Reported to House

Walnut Canyon National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Walnut Canyon National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the boundaries of Walnut Canyon National Monument in the State of Arizona.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
12/22/1995Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-199.
03/14/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 371 - 49 (Roll No. 232).
02/28/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-60.
01/18/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
12/22/1995SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 303.
12/22/1995SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 104-199.
12/06/1995SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/09/1995SenateSubcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation
10/13/1995SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of Agriculture, Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
03/16/1995SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/15/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/14/1995-5:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/1995-5:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 371 - 49 (Roll No. 232).
03/14/1995-5:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
03/14/1995-3:02pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/14/1995-2:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
03/14/1995-2:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3103-3104, H3116-3117)
03/14/1995-2:57pmHouseMr. Hayworth moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/28/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 33.
02/28/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-60.
02/15/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
02/15/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/26/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/26/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/24/1995HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands
01/23/1995HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
01/23/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/18/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
01/18/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/13/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/13/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/13/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 02/13/1995

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/18/1995 Referred to
02/15/1995 Markup by
02/28/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-60
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Lands01/23/1995 Referred to
01/24/1995 Hearings by
01/26/1995 Markup by
01/26/1995 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/15/1995 Referred to
12/06/1995 Markup by
12/22/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-199
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Parks, Historic Preservation, and Recreation03/16/1995 Referred to
11/09/1995 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.562. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (03/14/1995)

Walnut Canyon National Monument Boundary Modification Act of 1995 - Modifies the boundaries of the Walnut Canyon National Monument in Arizona.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to acquire lands and interests in lands within the Monument. Transfers Federal property: (1) within the boundaries of the Monument (as modified by this Act) to the administrative jurisdiction of the Secretary of the Interior for management as part of the Monument; and (2) excluded from the Monument (pursuant to the boundary modification) to the administrative jurisdiction of the Secretary of Agriculture to be managed as part of the Coconino National Forest.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Director of the National Park Service, to manage the Monument as a unit of the National Park Service.

Authorizes appropriations.