Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/19/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/08/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/08/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/08/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/08/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/08/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/08/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/09/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/15/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/21/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/21/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew