Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 01/23/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/23/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/26/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 01/26/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/30/1995