Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/18/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/07/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/07/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/13/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/13/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/13/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/14/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/14/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/14/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/28/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/11/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/18/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 07/18/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/31/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/31/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/18/1995