Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/20/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/02/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/02/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/02/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/02/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/02/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/02/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/21/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/21/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/21/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 02/21/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/21/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/02/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 03/02/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/02/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/02/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/16/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/08/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew