Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/24/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/24/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/03/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/03/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/03/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/03/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/1995
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 02/03/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/03/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/03/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/03/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/03/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/03/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/03/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/08/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/08/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/08/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/08/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/15/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/15/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/16/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/24/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/28/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 02/28/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/03/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/08/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/04/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/05/1995