There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Retirement Equity Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit retired members of the Armed Forces who have a service-connected disability to receive military retired pay concurrently with veterans' disability compensation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/04/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/18/1995Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
01/18/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on National Security
01/04/1995Referred to the House Committee on National Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (145)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/17/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 01/17/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/17/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 01/17/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/19/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/19/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 01/19/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/23/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/03/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/03/1995
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/03/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/03/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/09/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/09/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/09/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/09/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/09/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/14/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/14/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/14/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/14/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/14/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/14/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/22/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR-1] 02/22/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/01/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/07/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/10/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 03/16/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/16/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/22/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/22/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/24/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/29/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/04/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/04/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/02/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/02/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/02/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/24/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/13/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/13/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/16/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/21/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/27/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/27/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/27/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/29/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/29/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/30/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/30/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/30/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 07/11/1995
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 07/13/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/13/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/18/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/28/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/28/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/28/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 09/06/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/06/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 09/21/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 09/29/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/29/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/11/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/19/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/02/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 12/06/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/23/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/01/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/29/1996
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/29/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/05/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/13/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/13/1996
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/21/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/18/1996
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/18/1996
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/09/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/1996
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 05/22/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/13/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/10/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/02/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/11/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/25/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House National Security01/04/1995 Referred to
House National Security Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/18/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.65.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.65. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/04/1995)

Military Retirement Equity Act of 1995 - Permits retired members of the armed forces to be paid retirement pay concurrently with compensation for any service-connected disability if the person's entitlement to such retirement pay is based solely on age, length of service, or both.

Reduces the retirement pay of individuals receiving both types of pay by a specified percentage of the disability compensation which decreases as the disability rating increases. Prohibits any reduction in the retirement pay of a disabled person when the disability rating is total.

Declares that, once the Federal budget deficit has been reduced, the Congress should reexamine and eliminate any offset of retired pay by a veteran's disability compensation.