There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Housing Act to modify the exemption from certain familial status discrimination prohibitions granted to housing for older persons.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/1995Became Public Law No: 104-76. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/1995Signed by President.
12/19/1995Presented to President.
12/18/1995Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
12/06/1995Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 94-3. Record Vote No: 590.
11/09/1995Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-172. Additional and minority views filed.
04/06/1995Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 424 - 5 (Roll no. 297).
03/28/1995Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-91.
01/24/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (39)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/28/1995Became Public Law No: 104-76. (TXT | PDF)
12/28/1995Signed by President.
12/19/1995HousePresented to President.
12/18/1995-12:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/18/1995-12:53pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
12/18/1995-12:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
12/18/1995-12:07pmHouseMr. Canady moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
12/07/1995SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/1995SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 94-3. Record Vote No: 590.
12/06/1995SenateMeasure laid before Senate. (consideration: CR S18063-18071)
11/09/1995SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 231.
11/09/1995SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 104-172. Additional and minority views filed.
10/26/1995SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/02/1995SenateSubcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, Property. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights
08/01/1995SenateSubcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, Property. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights
04/07/1995SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
04/06/1995-1:42pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/06/1995-1:42pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 424 - 5 (Roll no. 297).
04/06/1995-1:21pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
04/06/1995-1:21pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/06/1995-1:20pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 660.
04/06/1995-1:20pmHouseH.Amdt.339 On agreeing to the Judiciary amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
04/06/1995-1:20pmHouseH.Amdt.339 Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Judiciary.
04/06/1995-12:45pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate.
04/06/1995-12:45pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 126 and Rule XXIII.
04/06/1995-12:45pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable John J. Duncan Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee.
04/06/1995-12:44pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 660 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary now printed in the bill. Each section of the committee amendment in the nature of a substitute shall be considered as read.
04/06/1995-12:44pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 126. (consideration: CR H4360-4365)
04/06/1995-12:42pmHouseRule H. Res. 126 passed House.
04/03/1995-6:39pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 126 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 660 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill for the purpose of amendment the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary now printed in the bill. Each section of the committee amendment in the nature of a substitute shall be considered as read.
03/28/1995HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 44.
03/28/1995HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-91.
03/22/1995HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 6.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/1995HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/15/1995HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
03/15/1995HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
03/10/1995HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/24/1995HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/24/1995HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (23)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/24/1995 Referred to
03/22/1995 Markup by
03/28/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-91
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/10/1995 Referred to
03/15/1995 Markup by
03/15/1995 Reported by
Senate Judiciary04/07/1995 Referred to
10/26/1995 Markup by
11/09/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-172
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights08/01/1995 Hearings by
08/02/1995 Markup by
08/02/1995 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.660. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (12/06/1995)

Housing for Older Persons Act of 1995 - Amends the Fair Housing Act with regard to the definition of housing for older persons by: (1) deleting the "significant facilities and services" requirement; and (2) requiring at least 80 percent of occupied units to be occupied by at least one person 55 years of age or older. (Thus modifying the exemption from certain familial status discrimination prohibitions.)

Makes a good faith attempt at compliance a defense against civil money damages.