Committees: H.R.660 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary01/24/1995 Referred to
03/22/1995 Markup by
03/28/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-91
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/10/1995 Referred to
03/15/1995 Markup by
03/15/1995 Reported by
Senate Judiciary04/07/1995 Referred to
10/26/1995 Markup by
11/09/1995 Reported by S. Rept. 104-172
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution, Federalism, and Property Rights08/01/1995 Hearings by
08/02/1995 Markup by
08/02/1995 Reported by