Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 01/26/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/26/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/06/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/06/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/06/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/06/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/06/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/06/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 02/06/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/06/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/06/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/06/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/06/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/06/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/06/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/06/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/07/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 02/09/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/09/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/09/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/10/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/10/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/23/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/23/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/01/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/01/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/01/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/22/1995