Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 01/11/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/11/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/11/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 01/18/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/20/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/24/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/24/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 01/25/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/25/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/26/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 01/30/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/30/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/30/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 01/31/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/03/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/03/1995
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/06/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/06/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/07/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/07/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/07/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/07/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/07/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/08/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/08/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/08/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/08/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/10/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/10/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/10/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/10/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/14/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/21/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/22/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/28/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/02/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/06/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/07/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/09/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/15/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/15/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/15/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/28/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 04/03/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/03/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/02/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/09/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/15/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/18/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/22/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew