Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/21/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/21/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/21/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/21/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/21/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/03/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/03/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/03/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/03/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/06/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/06/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/03/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/03/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/03/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/03/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/03/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/03/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/15/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/06/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/06/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/13/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/13/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/19/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/11/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 07/18/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/18/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/20/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/20/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/20/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/24/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/07/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/14/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/04/1996