Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/17/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/17/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/17/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/17/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/08/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/08/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/28/1995