Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/31/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/31/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/31/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/31/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/07/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/07/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/08/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/16/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/16/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/23/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/28/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 02/28/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/28/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/28/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/08/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/09/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/16/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/06/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/10/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/10/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/16/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/16/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/16/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/16/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/18/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/29/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 06/29/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/29/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 07/10/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/10/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/10/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/11/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/13/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/02/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 08/02/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/06/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/06/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/12/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 10/12/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 11/08/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/08/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 11/08/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 11/10/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/10/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/14/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 12/13/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/19/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/22/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 04/18/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/18/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/30/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/08/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/08/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/26/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/26/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 08/02/1996