Committees: H.R.743 — 104th Congress (1995-1996)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Economic and Educational Opportunities01/30/1995 Referred to
05/11/1995 Hearings by
06/22/1995 Markup by
09/18/1995 Reported by H. Rept. 104-248
House Economic and Educational Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations03/03/1995 Referred to
03/07/1995 Markup by
03/07/1995 Reported by
Senate Labor and Human Resources09/29/1995 Referred to
07/10/1996 Discharged from