Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/06/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/13/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/23/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/23/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/08/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/16/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/12/1995