Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/31/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/27/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/27/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/27/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/27/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/27/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/27/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/27/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/27/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/27/1995
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/27/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 02/27/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/10/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/10/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/10/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/10/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/10/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/05/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/14/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/1995