Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 01/09/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 01/09/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 01/11/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 01/11/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 01/11/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/11/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 01/11/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/11/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/11/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/11/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/11/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 01/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/17/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/17/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 01/18/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/18/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 01/18/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/19/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 01/19/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/20/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 01/20/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/20/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/25/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/25/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/30/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/06/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/06/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/06/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/06/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/13/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/28/1995