Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/01/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/28/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/28/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/28/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 02/28/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/28/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/28/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/21/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/21/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/04/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/06/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/06/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/19/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/19/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/06/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/06/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 12/22/1995
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/14/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/14/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/15/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/29/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 05/07/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/30/1996
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/24/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/24/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/12/1996