Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/01/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/01/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/09/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/09/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/09/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/27/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/30/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 05/22/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/23/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/17/1996