Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/02/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/02/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/02/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/03/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/03/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/06/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/06/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/06/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/06/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/06/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/06/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/09/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/09/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/09/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/16/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/22/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/24/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 02/24/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/28/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/01/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/03/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/03/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/03/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/03/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/06/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/06/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/06/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/07/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/07/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/07/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/14/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 03/14/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/14/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/28/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/28/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/28/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/03/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/05/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/09/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/11/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/11/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/16/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/16/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/16/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/18/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/23/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/23/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/23/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/24/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/25/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/07/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/07/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/07/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/07/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/07/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 06/14/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/14/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/20/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/22/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/22/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/27/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/27/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/27/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/27/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/28/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/30/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/10/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/10/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/11/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 07/19/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/24/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/25/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/31/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/03/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/03/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/06/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/06/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/12/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/12/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/12/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/13/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/13/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/14/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/19/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/19/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/19/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/27/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/27/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/27/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/27/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/28/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/28/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/11/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 10/17/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 10/18/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 10/31/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/08/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/09/1995
Rep. Bunn, Jim [R-OR-5] 11/09/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/09/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/13/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/14/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 12/12/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/13/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 12/19/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/05/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/21/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/30/1996
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/30/1996
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/04/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/17/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/17/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 09/18/1996
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/18/1996
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/18/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/24/1996
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/1996
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/24/1996
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew