Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/06/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/06/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/06/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/06/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/10/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/10/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/10/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/10/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 02/10/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/10/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/16/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/16/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/16/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/16/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/16/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/16/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 02/22/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/22/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/22/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/28/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/08/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/08/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/08/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/15/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/24/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 12/19/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/23/1996