Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 02/06/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/07/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/07/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/07/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/13/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/13/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/24/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/27/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/28/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/28/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/01/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 08/01/1995