Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/09/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 03/09/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/09/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/09/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/09/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/09/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/09/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/09/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/09/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/09/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/09/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/09/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/09/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/09/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/09/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/09/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 03/09/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/09/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/09/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 03/09/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/09/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/09/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/09/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/09/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/09/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/09/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/09/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/09/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/09/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 03/09/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/09/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/09/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/09/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/09/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/09/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/09/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/09/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/09/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/15/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/15/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/15/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/15/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/15/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/15/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/15/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/15/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/15/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/15/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/15/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/15/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/15/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/15/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/24/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/24/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/24/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/24/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/29/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/29/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/24/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/24/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/24/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 07/11/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/11/1996
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/11/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/11/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/11/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/11/1996
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/1996