There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the credit for increasing research activities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/02/1995Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E259)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (82)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/10/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/10/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/10/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/10/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 02/10/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/10/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/21/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/21/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/24/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 03/03/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/03/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/10/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/10/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/10/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/10/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/10/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/10/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/10/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/10/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/10/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/10/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 03/10/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/21/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/24/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/24/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/24/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/24/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/05/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/05/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 04/05/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/05/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/05/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/02/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/02/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/02/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/02/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/02/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/02/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/10/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/10/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/10/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/10/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/10/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/10/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/15/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/15/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/15/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/21/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/30/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/21/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/03/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 09/21/1995

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/02/1995 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.803. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/1995)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to make permanent the credit for increasing research activities.