Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/03/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/03/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/15/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/01/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/01/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/01/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/01/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/19/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/19/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/16/1996