Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/07/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/07/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/28/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/28/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/28/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/28/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/28/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/06/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/06/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/14/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/14/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/14/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/14/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/14/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/14/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/14/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/23/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 03/23/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/28/1995