Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/08/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/21/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/21/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/21/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/21/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/10/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/10/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/10/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/10/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/10/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/10/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/10/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/21/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/21/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/21/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/21/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/21/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/21/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/23/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/23/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/23/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/23/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/30/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/30/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/30/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/30/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/01/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/01/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/01/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/01/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/01/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/01/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/07/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/07/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/07/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/27/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/27/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 06/27/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/27/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/18/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/18/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/18/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/18/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/18/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/28/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 11/09/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 11/09/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/09/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/09/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/09/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/27/1996
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/27/1996
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/27/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 02/27/1996
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/07/1996
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/15/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/15/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/15/1996
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/15/1996
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/15/1996
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/15/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/15/1996
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/21/1996
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/21/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/21/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/1996
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/21/1996
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 05/21/1996
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 05/21/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/27/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/27/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/05/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/05/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/24/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 09/24/1996