Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/24/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/13/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 06/13/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/14/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/14/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/16/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/30/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/30/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/10/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/10/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/24/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/29/1995