Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/09/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/13/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 02/13/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/13/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/13/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 02/13/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/13/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/13/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 02/13/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/13/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/15/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/15/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/15/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/15/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/15/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/15/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/15/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/15/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/15/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/15/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/15/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/15/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/15/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/22/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/22/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 02/22/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/22/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/22/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/22/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/22/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/22/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/22/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/22/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/22/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/22/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/27/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/27/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/27/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/27/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 02/27/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/27/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/02/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/02/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/02/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/02/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/02/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/02/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/06/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/06/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 03/06/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/08/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/23/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/23/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/23/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/23/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/09/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/24/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/07/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/07/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/07/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/07/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/07/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/07/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/07/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 06/07/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/07/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/07/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/13/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/13/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/13/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/13/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/28/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/28/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/28/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/27/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/27/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 07/27/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/27/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/27/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/30/1996