Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/09/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 03/28/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/28/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/28/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/28/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/28/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/28/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/28/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/28/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/28/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/25/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/25/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/25/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/25/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/14/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 11/09/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/01/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/01/1996
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 02/01/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/01/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 02/01/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/01/1996
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/1996
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/01/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/01/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/28/1996
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 02/28/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/28/1996
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/12/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/12/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/12/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/24/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/24/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/24/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/23/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/23/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/23/1996
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/23/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/23/1996
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/1996
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/13/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/13/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/13/1996
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/13/1996
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/19/1996
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/19/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/10/1996
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/18/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/22/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/31/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/02/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 09/12/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/1996
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/25/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/25/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/1996
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/04/1996