Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/10/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/10/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/10/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/10/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/21/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/21/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/21/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/21/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/21/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 02/21/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2] 02/21/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 02/21/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 02/21/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/21/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/21/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 02/21/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 02/21/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/21/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/21/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/21/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/21/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/21/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/21/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/24/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/24/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/24/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/24/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/24/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/24/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/24/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 02/24/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/24/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/24/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/24/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/03/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 03/03/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/03/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/03/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/10/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/1995
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/10/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/10/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/10/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/10/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 03/10/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/21/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/21/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/21/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/21/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/24/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/24/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/24/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/24/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/24/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/06/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/06/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/06/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/06/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/06/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/06/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/06/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/06/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/02/1995
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/02/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/15/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/15/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/15/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/15/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/15/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/25/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/25/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/25/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/16/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/16/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 06/16/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/26/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/30/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/17/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 07/17/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/17/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/17/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/25/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/25/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 07/28/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 07/28/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 07/28/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/28/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 08/04/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/07/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/12/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 10/17/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew