There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of State to establish a set of voluntary guidelines to promote socially responsible business practices for United States businesses operating in foreign countries.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/1995Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
02/24/1995Referred to the Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
02/13/1995Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1995Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E331)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/1995Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/13/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/06/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/06/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/06/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/06/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/06/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/23/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/23/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/23/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/23/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/02/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/08/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/17/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/17/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/17/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/17/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/19/1996

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/13/1995 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade02/24/1995 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.910.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.910. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/1995)

Directs the Secretary of State to establish guidelines which U.S. nationals should use in conducting business operations in any foreign country. Requires such guidelines to be based on principles contained in guidelines or standards of the Organization for Economic Cooperation and Development, the International Labor Organization, and the General Agreement on Tariffs and Trade as well as on the MacBride, Sullivan, Minnesota or Caux, and Slepak Principles.

Directs U.S. nationals conducting business operations in any foreign country to submit a statement to the Secretary indicating whether they are complying with such guidelines and to register with the Secretary.

Authorizes Federal agencies to intercede with foreign governments or nationals regarding export marketing activities on behalf of a U.S. national only if such national is in compliance with the guidelines.