Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 02/13/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/14/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/14/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/21/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/06/1995
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/06/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/20/1995