Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/17/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/17/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/17/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/17/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/17/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/17/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/17/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 01/17/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/17/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/26/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/26/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/26/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5] 02/03/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/03/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/03/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/27/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/27/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/23/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/23/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/23/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/10/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/10/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/10/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/10/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/07/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/07/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/15/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/15/1995
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/28/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/28/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 06/28/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 06/28/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/04/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 08/04/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew