Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/14/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/14/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/14/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/28/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/10/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/10/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/29/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/03/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/03/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 04/03/1995
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 04/03/1995
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/09/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/1995
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/23/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/23/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/23/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/23/1995
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/1995
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/08/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/08/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/10/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/24/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/31/1995
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/31/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 07/31/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 07/31/1995
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/31/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/31/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 08/04/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/14/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/14/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/23/1996
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/30/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/20/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/18/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/24/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/06/1996
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/23/1996