Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/03/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/03/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1995
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/03/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/03/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/03/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/03/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/03/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/03/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/03/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/16/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/16/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/16/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/16/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/16/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/24/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/24/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/24/1995
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/24/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/24/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/24/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/24/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/24/1995
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/24/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/30/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 03/30/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/30/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/30/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 03/30/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/30/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/30/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/30/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/30/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/30/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/30/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 03/30/1995
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/30/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/30/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/09/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/09/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/09/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/09/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/09/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/09/1995
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/09/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/16/1995
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/16/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/16/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/16/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/16/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/16/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/16/1995
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/16/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3] 05/16/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/16/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/16/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/16/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/16/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/16/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/16/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/23/1995
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/23/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/23/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/23/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/06/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/22/1995
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/22/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/22/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/22/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/22/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/22/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/22/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/13/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/13/1995
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/19/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/19/1995
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/19/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/26/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/26/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/04/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/04/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 08/04/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/04/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/21/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/21/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/21/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/21/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/21/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/21/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8] 09/21/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/21/1995
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/21/1995
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/21/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/21/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/21/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/21/1995