Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/09/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/09/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/09/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 01/09/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 01/09/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 01/09/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/09/1995
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 01/09/1995
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/09/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/09/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 01/09/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 01/19/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/19/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 01/19/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/19/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/19/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/19/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/19/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 01/19/1995
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/19/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/26/1995
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/26/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/26/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/26/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 01/26/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/26/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/08/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/08/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/08/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/08/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/08/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/22/1995
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/29/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/23/1996