Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/15/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/15/1995
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Ward, Mike [D-KY-3]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/15/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/28/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/28/1995
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/09/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/09/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/09/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/09/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/09/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/09/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/17/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 05/17/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/17/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/08/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/08/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/04/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/04/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/04/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/04/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/04/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/04/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/04/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/04/1995