Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/23/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/02/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/02/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/13/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/13/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/13/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/13/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/13/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/13/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/13/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/13/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/13/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/23/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/23/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/23/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/17/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 05/17/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/17/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/17/1995
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/17/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/29/1995
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/20/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/20/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/20/1995
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/1995
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 08/01/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/01/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/01/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 09/07/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/13/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/10/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/10/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/31/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/07/1995
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 12/12/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/20/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/06/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/12/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/14/1996
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/02/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/10/1996
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/1996
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/10/1996