There is one summary for H.R.989. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/1995)

Copyright Term Extension Act of 1995 - Amends Federal copyright provisions regarding preemption of laws concerning duration of copyrights. Prohibits the annulment or limitation of rights or remedies under State laws with respect to sound recordings fixed before February 15, 1972, until February 15, 2067 (currently, 2047).

Extends the duration of copyright in a work created on or after January 1, 1978, to the life of the author and 70 (currently, 50) years after the author's death. Makes the same extension with regard to joint works created on or after such date.

Extends the duration of copyright in anonymous or pseudonymous works or works made for hire on or after such date to 95 (currently, 75) years from the year of the first publication, or 120 (currently, 100) years from the year of creation, whichever expires first. Makes conforming extensions with respect to provisions regarding the presumption of an author's death.

Extends the duration of copyright in works created before January 1, 1978 (but not published or copyrighted), to at least December 31, 2012 (currently, 2002). Extends from December 31, 2027, to December 31, 2047, the duration of copyright in works published on or before December 31, 2012.

Extends the duration of certain subsisting copyright renewals by a period of 20 years.